NJ AJR21 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR107
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates months of June through September of each year as "Jersey Fresh Season."
Title
Designates months of June through September of each year as "Jersey Fresh Season."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR107 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee