NJ AJR21 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous AJR32

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by SJR59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates May of each year as "Civil War Veterans Recognition Month," in honor of the Grand Army of the Republic and the Sons of Union Veterans of the Civil War.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates May of each year as "Civil War Veterans Recognition Month," in honor of the Grand Army of the Republic and the Sons of Union Veterans of the Civil War.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblySubstituted by SJR59
2019-11-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR32 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SJR59 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback