NJ AJR20 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR84
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates July 1 of each year as "U.S. Cadet Nurse Corps Day."
Title
Designates July 1 of each year as "U.S. Cadet Nurse Corps Day."
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR84 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR112 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR112 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR20 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/20_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR20 |