NJ AJR160 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR72
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates 100th anniversary of Armistice during World War I.
Title
Commemorates 100th anniversary of Armistice during World War I.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
AJR160 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR160 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/160_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR160 |