NJ AJR113 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the week in November of each year that includes Thanksgiving as "Caregivers Appreciation Week." *
Title
Designates the week in November of each year that includes Thanksgiving as "Caregivers Appreciation Week." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tucker) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |