NJ ACR68 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR124
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR71
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR71
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress of United States to enact legislation requiring paper account statements be provided to elder adults.
Title
Urges President and Congress of United States to enact legislation requiring paper account statements be provided to elder adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR68 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR71 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR71 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR68 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/68_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR68 |