NJ ACR53 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR46
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR111
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR202
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR146
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR111
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR202
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass "Palliative Care and Hospice Education and Training Act" and fund initiatives to expand palliative care.
Title
Urges Congress to pass "Palliative Care and Hospice Education and Training Act" and fund initiatives to expand palliative care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR53 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
ACR53 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
ACR202 (Carry Over) 2018-10-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SCR46 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR146 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR53 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
ACR202 (Carry Over) 2018-10-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SCR46 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR146 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR53 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/53_I1.HTM |