NJ ACR250 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Determines that Fish and Game Council's adopted rule to allow use of enclosed foothold traps is inconsistent with plain language and legislative intent of 1984 law banning animal traps of steel-jaw leghold type.
Title
Determines that Fish and Game Council's adopted rule to allow use of enclosed foothold traps is inconsistent with plain language and legislative intent of 1984 law banning animal traps of steel-jaw leghold type.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-15-8) |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR175 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/ACR250 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/ACR/250_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR250 |