NJ ACR25 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR175
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR175
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR175
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Determines that Fish and Game Council's adopted rule to allow use of enclosed foothold traps is inconsistent with plain language and legislative intent of 1984 law banning animal traps of steel-jaw leghold type.
Title
Determines that Fish and Game Council's adopted rule to allow use of enclosed foothold traps is inconsistent with plain language and legislative intent of 1984 law banning animal traps of steel-jaw leghold type.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-10-11) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | INT 1RA REF ARO |
Same As/Similar To
SCR11 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SCR175 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SCR175 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
SCR175 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SCR175 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/ACR25 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/ACR/25_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR25 |