NJ ACR233 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approves FY 2020 Financial Plan of NJ Infrastructure Bank.
Title
Approves FY 2020 Financial Plan of NJ Infrastructure Bank.
Sponsors
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] |
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR168 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for SCR168 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-1) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR168 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by ACR233
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/ACR233 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/ACR/233_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR233 |