NJ ACR231 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR181
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by SCR144
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by SCR144
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commends Rutgers University Coastal Ocean Observation Laboratory for contributions to ocean research, data collection, technology, and forecasting.
Title
Commends Rutgers University Coastal Ocean Observation Laboratory for contributions to ocean research, data collection, technology, and forecasting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR144 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR181 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
SCR144 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR144 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/ACR231 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/ACR/231_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR231 |