NJ ACR196 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR55
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges U.S. Preventive Services Task Force to lower recommended colorectal cancer screening age from 50 to 45.
Title
Urges U.S. Preventive Services Task Force to lower recommended colorectal cancer screening age from 50 to 45.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-1) |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR196 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR139 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR139 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee