NJ ACR195 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by SCR152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by SCR152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Approves FY 2014 Financial Plan of NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Title
Approves FY 2014 Financial Plan of NJ Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Rep. Joseph Egan [D] |
Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR152 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR152 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/ACR195 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/ACR/195_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/ACR/195_R1.HTM |