NJ ACR192 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Invalidates Civil Service Commission job banding rule.
Title
Invalidates Civil Service Commission job banding rule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Scr147 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr147 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr147 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Concurrent Resolution Placed on |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Public Hearing Held ASL |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR147 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by ACR192
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/ACR192 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/ACR/192_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR192 |