NJ ACR190 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Petitions federal government for emergency response funding to support safe reopening of schools following COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Petitions federal government for emergency response funding to support safe reopening of schools following COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR124 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (38-0) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Substituted for SCR124 |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0) |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR124 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by ACR190
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR190 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/190_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR190 |