NJ ACR151 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges construction of microgrids at municipal facilities in New Jersey.
Title
Urges construction of microgrids at municipal facilities in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Scr108 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (37-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for SCR108 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR108 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by ACR151
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/ACR151 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/ACR/151_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR151 |