NJ ACR151 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Determines that draft proposed medicinal marijuana program rules are inconsistent with legislative intent.
Title
Determines that draft proposed medicinal marijuana program rules are inconsistent with legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-15 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Senate (22-16) | |
2010-12-13 | Substituted for SCR130 (2R) | |
2010-11-22 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-22 | Passed by the Assembly (48-22-7) | |
2010-11-08 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR130 (Same As) 2011-02-03 - Public Hearing Placed on Desk Assembly Transcript Placed on Desk
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/ACR151 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/ACR/151_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR151 |