NJ ACR144 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns EPA decision to withdraw from "once-in-always-in" policy under Clean Air Act.
Title
Condemns EPA decision to withdraw from "once-in-always-in" policy under Clean Air Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR121 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (26-12) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for SCR121 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (52-13-8) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR121 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by ACR144
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/ACR144 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/ACR/144_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR144 |