NJ ACR129 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR21
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR122
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR105
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR122
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR105
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges parties to 1954 U.S. Supreme Court Decree to address ongoing risk of Delaware River Basin flooding.
Title
Urges parties to 1954 U.S. Supreme Court Decree to address ongoing risk of Delaware River Basin flooding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR129 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
SCR100 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR122 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
SCR105 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SCR100 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
ACR122 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
SCR105 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/ACR129 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/ACR/129_I1.HTM |