NJ ACR102 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR41
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR26
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR77
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR110
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR69
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR108
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR26
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR77
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR110
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR69
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR108
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to increase to $500 veterans' property tax deduction.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to increase to $500 veterans' property tax deduction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR102 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR102 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR102 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR26 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR110 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SCR32 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR69 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SCR108 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR102 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR102 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR26 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR110 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SCR32 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
ACR69 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SCR108 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR102 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/102_I1.HTM |