NJ A996 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1104

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates "Economic Gardening Program" in Department of State to provide customized services to certain businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates "Economic Gardening Program" in Department of State to provide customized services to certain businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1104 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1476 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback