NJ A986 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2957
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes telemarketing fraud investigation unit.
Title
Establishes telemarketing fraud investigation unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S247 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-3) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S247 (1R) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-13-5) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A986 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S247 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A986 (1R)
S247 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A986 (1R)