NJ A925 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Substituted by S618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Substituted by S618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school buses transporting certain disabled persons to use flashing lights and establishes penalties for drivers who fail to yield.
Title
Requires school buses transporting certain disabled persons to use flashing lights and establishes penalties for drivers who fail to yield.
Sponsors
Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Rep. Nelson Albano [D] |
Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S618 |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S618 (Same As) 2012-07-12 - Approved P.L.2012, c.20.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A925 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1000/925_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1000/925_R1.HTM |