NJ A918 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4100

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S377 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires hospital patient's medical record to include notation if patient is at increased risk of confusion, agitation, behavioral problems, and wandering due to dementia related disorder.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires hospital patient's medical record to include notation if patient is at increased risk of confusion, agitation, behavioral problems, and wandering due to dementia related disorder.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07AssemblySubstituted by S377 (1R)
2017-11-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4100 (Carry Over) 2015-01-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S377 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback