NJ A908 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4635
Note: Carry Over of previous S3894
Note: Carry Over of previous S3894
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-12-19 - Substituted by S715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-12-19 - Substituted by S715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires AG to establish rape kit tracking system.
Title
Requires AG to establish rape kit tracking system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by S715 |
2024-12-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4635 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3894 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S715 (Same As) 2025-01-23 - Approved P.L.2025, c.1.
S3894 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S715 (Same As) 2025-01-23 - Approved P.L.2025, c.1.