NJ A882 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4659
Note: Carry Over of previous A4659
Note: Carry Over of previous A4659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to study issues and make recommendations regarding Marie H. Katzenbach School for the Deaf.
Title
Establishes task force to study issues and make recommendations regarding Marie H. Katzenbach School for the Deaf.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4659 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1742 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4659 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1742 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4659 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A882 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A1000/882_I1.HTM |