NJ A879 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3829
Note: Carry Over of previous A4570
Note: Carry Over of previous A4570
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of "Nurse" title by unlicensed person.
Title
Prohibits use of "Nurse" title by unlicensed person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A879 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4570 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S391 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4570 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S391 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A879 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A1000/879_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A879 |