NJ A801 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A818
Note: Carry Foward to future S1680
Note: Carry Over of previous A2312
Note: Carry Foward to future S1680
Note: Carry Over of previous A2312
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires 40 hours annual in-service training for State corrections officers.
Title
Requires 40 hours annual in-service training for State corrections officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A801 (Carry Over) 2017-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A801 (Carry Over) 2017-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2312 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1813 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A801 (Carry Over) 2017-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2312 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1813 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A801 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A1000/801_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A801 |