NJ A795 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3544
Note: Carry Foward to future S2919
Note: Carry Over of previous A1836
Note: Carry Foward to future S2919
Note: Carry Over of previous A1836
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employer to provide certain accommodations to employee who is breast feeding.
Title
Requires employer to provide certain accommodations to employee who is breast feeding.
Sponsors
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Shama Haider [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A795 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A795 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1836 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3135 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A795 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1836 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3135 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading