NJ A792 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3048
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of multi-species depredation permit for wildlife control on farmland.
Title
Authorizes issuance of multi-species depredation permit for wildlife control on farmland.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3048 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2782 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2782 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee