NJ A784 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A784
Note: Carry Foward to future S1428
Note: Carry Over of previous A4380
Note: Carry Foward to future S1428
Note: Carry Over of previous A4380
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes multi-species depredation permit.
Title
Establishes multi-species depredation permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A784 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A784 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4380 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1595 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A784 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4380 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1595 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A784 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A1000/784_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A784 |