NJ A772 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes process for recovering cost of caring for domestic companion animals involved in animal cruelty violations.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes process for recovering cost of caring for domestic companion animals involved in animal cruelty violations.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-5-8)
2017-06-22AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
2017-06-08AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jones)
2016-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3034 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S1168 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback