NJ A760 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A582
Note: Carry Over of previous A4661
Note: Carry Over of previous A4661
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain professional boards to report licensure exam passage rates.
Title
Requires certain professional boards to report licensure exam passage rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1599 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S1599 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A760 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
A4661 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1599 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A760
A4661 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1599 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A760
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A760 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A1000/760_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A760 |