NJ A715 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A933
Note: Carry Over of previous A4613
Note: Carry Over of previous A4613
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1703
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1703
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts disabled veterans from beach buggy permit fees.
Title
Exempts disabled veterans from beach buggy permit fees.
Sponsors
Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] | Rep. Brian Rumpf [R] | Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S1703 |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A715 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1703
A4613 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1703 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.398.
A4613 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1703 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.398.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A715 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A1000/715_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A715 |