NJ A714 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A564
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2355 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2355 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public institution of higher education from using State funds in excess of$10,000 to pay fee of commencement and other speakes.*
Title
Prohibits public institution of higher education from using State funds in excess of$10,000 to pay fee of commencement and other speakes.*
Sponsors
Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2355 (1R) |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A564 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2355 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.61.
S2355 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.61.