NJ A665 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1030
Note: Carryover of previous A1030

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each board of education to adopt policy establishing temperature control standards and guidelines for school district facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each board of education to adopt policy establishing temperature control standards and guidelines for school district facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-2-0)
2018-03-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1030 (Carry Over) 2016-06-20 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1030 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2563 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback