NJ A653 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A158

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Motion To Table (46-26-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits payment to public employees at retirement for certain unused sick leave, provides for forfeiture of payment for unused sick leave for certain criminal convictions, and requires documentation for use of sick leave.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits payment to public employees at retirement for certain unused sick leave, provides for forfeiture of payment for unused sick leave for certain criminal convictions, and requires documentation for use of sick leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22AssemblyMotion To Table (46-26-0) (Greenwald)
2017-06-22AssemblyMotion To Relieve from Committee (Munoz)
2017-03-16AssemblyMotion To Table (49-24-0) (Greenwald)
2017-03-16AssemblyMotion To Make Order of the Day (Munoz)
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A158 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3146 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback