NJ A616 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A398
Note: Carry Foward to future S3080
Note: Carry Over of previous A760
Note: Carry Over of previous S3702
Note: Carry Foward to future S3080
Note: Carry Over of previous A760
Note: Carry Over of previous S3702
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Dropout Prevention and Reengagement of Out-of-School Youth in DOE, and the Student Dropout Prevention Task Force.
Title
Establishes the Office of Dropout Prevention and Reengagement of Out-of-School Youth in DOE, and the Student Dropout Prevention Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A616 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A616 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A760 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S316 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3702 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A616 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A760 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S316 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3702 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A616 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/616_I1.HTM |