NJ A6153 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A461
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4070 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4070 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases thresholds for environmental assessment requirements for certain transportation projects under Executive Order No. 215 of 1989.
Title
Increases thresholds for environmental assessment requirements for certain transportation projects under Executive Order No. 215 of 1989.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S4070 (1R) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6153 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4070 (1R)
S4070 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.351.
S4070 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.351.