NJ A6100 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4021 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to provide instruction on history and contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders as part of implementation of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Social Studies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to provide instruction on history and contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders as part of implementation of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Social Studies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-20AssemblySubstituted by S4021 (1R)
2021-12-09AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-12-02AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4021 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.416.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback