NJ A5824 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A323
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3986
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3986
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits member of Judicial Retirement System to defer retirement to serve as county prosecutor.
Title
Permits member of Judicial Retirement System to defer retirement to serve as county prosecutor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3986 |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5824 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3986
S3986 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.287.
S3986 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.287.