NJ A5816 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1503

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Decreases the penalty for certain parole violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decreases the penalty for certain parole violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-11-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-11-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2275 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1503 (Carry Over) 2016-05-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback