NJ A5703 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S328
Note: Carry Foward to future A2638
Note: Carry Foward to future A2638
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public transportation employees to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking.
Title
Requires public transportation employees to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5703 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5703 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4283 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5703 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4283 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee