NJ A5583 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3776 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3776 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns prevailing wage requirements for certain fabrication.
Title
Concerns prevailing wage requirements for certain fabrication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S3776 (2R) |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3776 (Same As) 2023-08-07 - Approved P.L.2023, c.133.