NJ A5446 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S273
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reporting of opioid deaths.
Title
Requires reporting of opioid deaths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3907 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3907 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5446 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3907 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5446 (1R)
S3907 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5446 (1R)