NJ A5380 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3683 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3683 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to provide certain student loan information.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to provide certain student loan information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3683 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3683 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.349.