NJ A5267 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (55-9-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (55-9-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to license certain qualifying hospitals providing elective angioplasty services.
Title
Requires DOH to license certain qualifying hospitals providing elective angioplasty services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-9-6) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3608 (Same As) 2017-12-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee