NJ A5259 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2340
Note: Carry Foward to future S1832
Note: Carry Foward to future S1832
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits commercial mobile service providers from disclosing customer's global positioning system data to third parties.
Title
Prohibits commercial mobile service providers from disclosing customer's global positioning system data to third parties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5259 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5259 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3732 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5259 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3732 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading