NJ A5254 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2448
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3447 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3447 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows public schools to let certain students not enrolled in school participate in high school interscholastic athletics; allows public high schools in same district to enter into cooperative sports programs under certain conditions.*
Title
Allows public schools to let certain students not enrolled in school participate in high school interscholastic athletics; allows public high schools in same district to enter into cooperative sports programs under certain conditions.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S3447 (2R) |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5254 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3447 (2R)
S3447 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-14-4)
S3447 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-14-4)