NJ A5216 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2707

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides US Armed Forces and Reserves members with protection against interference with enjoyment of any accommodation, facility, public accommodation, or privilege.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides US Armed Forces and Reserves members with protection against interference with enjoyment of any accommodation, facility, public accommodation, or privilege.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08AssemblySubstituted by S714
2017-12-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-12-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-12-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S714 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
S2707 (Carry Over) 2015-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback